US HB4960 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Became Public Law No: 114-193. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Became Public Law No: 114-193. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 525 N Broadway in Aurora, Illinois, as the "Kenneth M. Christy Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 525 N Broadway in Aurora, Illinois, as the "Kenneth M. Christy Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 525 N Broadway in Aurora, Illinois, as the "Kenneth M. Christy Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-193. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4922) |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-06-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3997) |
2016-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4960. |
2016-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3997-3998) |
2016-06-21 | House | Mr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Illinois
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Illinois
Postal service