US HB4957 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Indian Child Protection and Family Violence Prevention Act.
Title
Native American Child Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4560-4561) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4957. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4560-4562) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 395. |
2020-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-493. |
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2019-11-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4787 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Native Americans
Sex offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Native Americans
Sex offenses