US HB4957 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-160. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-160. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Federal building located at 99 New York Avenue, N.E., in the District of Columbia as the "Ariel Rios Federal Building". (Sec. 1) This bill designates the federal building located at 99 New York Avenue, N.E., in the District of Columbia as the "Ariel Rios Federal Building."
Title
To designate the Federal building located at 99 New York Avenue, N.E., in the District of Columbia as the "Ariel Rios Federal Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-160. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2832) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 180). (text: CR H2172) |
2016-05-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2192-2193) |
2016-05-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4957. |
2016-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2172-2173) |
2016-05-10 | House | Mr. Curbelo (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-03 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 111. |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-534. |
2016-04-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-20 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-04-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E496) |
2016-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2824 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 444.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Department of Justice
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Department of Justice
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics