US HB4947 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the deduction for qualified business income, to (1) make such deduction permanent, (2) limit to 21% the top tax rate on qualified business income, (3) repeal the limitation on the deduction based on amount of wages paid, and (4) revise the definition of "qualified trade or business" to mean any trade or business other than the trade of business of performing services as an employee. The bill provides that a change in the organizational structure of a corporation is not a taxable event if there is no change among the owners, their ownership interests, or the assets of the organization, The bill repeals the estate tax after 2019.
Title
Small Business Prosperity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB216 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2971 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2971 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Corporate finance and management
Income tax deductions
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Transfer and inheritance taxes
Income tax deductions
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Transfer and inheritance taxes
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4947/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4947/BILLS-116hr4947ih.pdf |