US HB4946 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-13)
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1075 North Tustin Street in Orange, California, as the "Specialist Trevor A. Win'E Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1075 North Tustin Street in Orange, California, as the "Specialist Trevor A. Win'E Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1075 North Tustin Street in Orange, California, as the "Specialist Trevor A. Win'E Post Office".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 368 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599.
2018-09-28SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-07-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-07-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 368 - 0 (Roll no. 329). (text: CR H6208)
2018-07-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6242-6243)
2018-07-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-07-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4946.
2018-07-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6208)
2018-07-16HouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-05-23HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-23HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2018-02-06HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E146)
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback