US HB4926 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Opportunity Carbon Fee Act of 2018 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose fees on: (1) fossil fuel products producing carbon dioxide emissions, including coal, petroleum products, and natural gas; (2) fluorinated greenhouse gases; (3) emissions of any greenhouse gas from any greenhouse gas emissions source; and (4) associated emissions (attributable to venting, flaring, and leakage across the supply chain). The bill directs the Department of the Treasury to: establish, implement, and report on a program to identify all major source categories of associated emissions and collect data on associated emissions from the coal, petroleum products, and natural gas supply chains; make specified adjustments to the new fees for importers and exporters of energy-intensive manufactured goods; make a specified payment each calendar year to certain Social Security beneficiaries, veterans, and disabled individuals; make cost mitigation grants to states to assist low-income and rural households and provide job training and worker transition assistance; and establish a website to make regular disclosures concerning revenue, tax savings, and benefits attributable to this bill. The bill also allows a new carbon fee offset tax credit for the lesser of: 6.2% of earned income, or $800.
Title
American Opportunity Carbon Fee Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Veterans' Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Veterans' Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Veterans' Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Veterans' Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Veterans' Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3420 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB1639 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2368 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1639 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2368 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Corporate finance and management
Disability assistance
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Income tax credits
Income tax rates
Manufacturing
Oil and gas
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Social security and elderly assistance
Taxation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Corporate finance and management
Disability assistance
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Income tax credits
Income tax rates
Manufacturing
Oil and gas
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Social security and elderly assistance
Taxation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4926/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4926/BILLS-115hr4926ih.pdf |