US HB4920 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Veterans Affairs Contracting Preference Consistency Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-12-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10270)
2019-12-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4920.
2019-12-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10270-10271)
2019-12-16HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-12-05HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-12-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-05HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
2019-11-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2019-10-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-10-30HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback