US HB4895 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CFTC Reauthorization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CFTC Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
2019-11-26HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 116-313.
2019-11-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2019-10-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2019-10-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4257 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB4333 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB4816 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback