US HB4895 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 657.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 657.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medgar Evers Home National Monument Act This bill establishes the Medgar Evers National Monument in Jackson, Mississippi, as a unit of the National Park System to preserve, protect, and interpret the home and history of the pivotal role of Medgar Evers in the civil rights movement. The National Park Service shall enter into a cooperative agreement with Tougaloo College in Tougaloo, Mississippi, for interpretive and educational programming related to the monument.
Title
Medgar Evers Home National Monument Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 657. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-370. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-05-15 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3949) |
2018-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4895. |
2018-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3949-3951) |
2018-05-15 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 483. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-632. |
2018-02-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2889 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.