US HB4894 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Congressional Budget Justification Transparency Act of 2019 This bill requires federal agencies to make budget justification materials available to the public. The bill also requires the Office of Management and Budget to make certain details regarding the materials available to the public, including a list of the agencies that submit budget justification materials to Congress, the dates that the materials are submitted to Congress and posted online, and links to the materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional Budget Justification Transparency Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2560 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 436.
HB5150 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback