US HB4890 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To impose a ban on the payment of bonuses to employees of the Internal Revenue Service until the Secretary of the Treasury develops and implements a comprehensive customer service strategy. (Sec. 1) This bill prohibits the Department of the Treasury from paying a bonus, award, or similar cash payment to any Internal Revenue Service (IRS) employee until Treasury develops and submits to Congress a comprehensive customer service strategy that has been reviewed and approved by the Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration. The strategy must include: (1) appropriate telephone and correspondence levels of service; (2) a thorough assessment of which services the IRS can shift to self-service options; and (3) proposals to improve customer service over the short-term, the medium-term, and the long-term. In developing the strategy, Treasury must consult with the National Taxpayer Advocate. Treasury must submit semiannual reports to Congress on the status of its customer service strategy and actions taken to improve customer service. (Sec. 2) No additional funds are authorized to be appropriated or otherwise made available to carry out this bill.
Title
To impose a ban on the payment of bonuses to employees of the Internal Revenue Service until the Secretary of the Treasury develops and implements a comprehensive customer service strategy.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - On Passage (Y: 260 N: 158 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-21 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 260 - 158 (Roll no. 162). |
2016-04-21 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text of measure in the nature of a substitute: CR H1909) |
2016-04-21 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1910) |
2016-04-21 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 4890. |
2016-04-21 | House | H.Amdt.981 On agreeing to the Sanford amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2016-04-21 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 688, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Sanford amendment No. 2 printed in House Report 114-503. |
2016-04-21 | House | H.Amdt.981 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Sanford. (consideration: CR H1909-1910; text: CR H1909-1910) |
2016-04-21 | House | H.Amdt.980 On agreeing to the Meehan amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2016-04-21 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 688, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Meehan amendment No. 1 printed in House Report 114-503. |
2016-04-21 | House | H.Amdt.980 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Meehan. (consideration: CR H1909; text: CR H1909) |
2016-04-21 | House | RISING INFORMALLY - The Committee of the Whole rose informally to receive a message. Subsequently the Committee resumed its' sitting. |
2016-04-21 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 4890. |
2016-04-21 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Rodney Davis to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2016-04-21 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 688 and Rule XVIII. |
2016-04-21 | House | Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 4890 and H.R. 3724. |
2016-04-21 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 688. (consideration: CR H1905-1908, H1908-1911) |
2016-04-18 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 688 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 4890 and H.R. 3724. |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 383. |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-501. |
2016-04-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 15. |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-04-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR688 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Department of the Treasury
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Wages and earnings