US HB4874 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements to the use of educational assistance provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs for flight training programs.
Title
Fly Vets Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5603 (Related) 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4874/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4874/BILLS-117hr4874ih.pdf |