US HB4859 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the declaration of nonnavigability in perpetuity for Rivercenter, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. This bill amends the Water Resources Development Act of 1988 to provide that the declaration of nonnavigability for the Rivercenter portion of the Delaware River, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, shall not expire (currently the declaration of nonnavigability for that area expires on November 17, 2018).
Title
To extend the declaration of nonnavigability in perpetuity for Rivercenter, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5303 (Related) 2016-09-29 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4859/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4859/BILLS-114hr4859ih.pdf |