US HB4855 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission to make between 200 and 300 megahertz of C-Band spectrum available for reallocation and the assignment of licenses through a system of competitive bidding. C-Band spectrum is electromagnetic spectrum between the frequencies of 3700 and 4200 megahertz. Such spectrum shall be for the provision of broadband internet access service, and the clearing and reallocation shall take place in a manner that ensures C-Band-dependent users (1) receive equal or better service than was previously available, and (2) receive such service continuously throughout the transition process.
Title
Clearing Broad Airwaves for New Deployment Act C–BAND Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2921 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Radio spectrum allocation
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Licensing and registrations
Radio spectrum allocation
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4855/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4855/BILLS-116hr4855ih.pdf |