US HB4854 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on October 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-257.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on October 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-257.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Justice Served Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the DNA Analysis Backlog Elimination Act of 2000 to add, as a purpose area under the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program, increasing the capacity of prosecutors to address the backlog of violent crime cases involving suspects identified through DNA evidence. The Department of Justice (DOJ) must allocate a specified percentage of grant funds for such purpose, subject to limitations. Additionally, of amounts made available over FY2019-FY2022 for a DNA analysis and capacity enhancement program and for other forensic activities, DOJ must allocate at least 5% for grants to prosecute cold cases involving violent crime, where suspects have been identified through DNA evidence.
Title
Justice Served Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 182 (Y: 377 N: 1 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-257. |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6348-6349) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 1 (Roll no. 182). (text: CR H3945) |
2018-05-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3956) |
2018-05-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4854. |
2018-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3945-3947) |
2018-05-15 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2345 (Same As) 2018-07-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.