US HB4847 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband Deployment Streamlining Act
Title
Broadband Deployment Streamlining Act
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1363 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4847/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4847/BILLS-115hr4847ih.pdf |