US HB4842 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of State to provide funds for a pavilion at Expo 2020 Dubai. Before providing such funds, the State Department shall notify Congress. The notification shall contain information on various related topics, including the source of such funds, an analysis of the human rights record of the United Arab Emirates (UAE), and a certification that each entity receiving such funds is not (1) in violation of UAE labor laws, (2) utilizing a victim of trafficking, or (3) in violation of any applicable anti-corruption laws. The funds shall be made available on a cost-matching basis from sources other than the U.S. government, to the maximum extent practicable. The State Department shall report to Congress within 180 days after the opening of the pavilion on (1) the number of participating U.S. businesses, and (2) the amount and source of any obtained matching funds.
Title
EXPO Act of 2019 Expositions Provide Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-10-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8585) |
2019-10-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4842. |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8585-8587) |
2019-10-29 | House | Mr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
Labor standards
Middle East
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
United Arab Emirates
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
Labor standards
Middle East
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
United Arab Emirates