US HB4819 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to revitalize existing university infrastructure relating to nuclear science and engineering and establish new university-based nuclear science and engineering facilities, and for other purposes.
Title
National Nuclear University Research Infrastructure Reinvestment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] |
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362. |
2022-09-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-466. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2021-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4346 (Related) 2022-08-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-167.