US HB4819 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 704.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DELTA Act Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DELTA Act Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 704.
2018-11-29SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
2018-11-28SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-07-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2018-07-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6312-6313)
2018-07-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4819.
2018-07-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6312-6315)
2018-07-17HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-05-22HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3196 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback