US HB4816 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands whistleblower protections with regard to commodities and securities law violations. Specifically, the bill extends protections from retaliation to individuals who (1) assist in a Commodity Futures Trading Commission (CFTC) investigation of these violations, (2) make disclosures that are required or protected under any law subject to the CFTC's jurisdiction, or (3) provide information to supervisors or other employees with the authority to investigate potential misconduct. Currently, these protections apply only to individuals who report information directly to the CFTC. The bill also provides for the processing of these whistleblower awards no later than one year after the deadline to file a claim.
Title
Whistleblower Programs Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2529 (Related) 2019-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB4895 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
HB6197 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
HB4895 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
HB6197 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business ethics
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Right of privacy
Securities
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business ethics
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Right of privacy
Securities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4816/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4816/BILLS-116hr4816ih.pdf |