US HB4805 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Pending: House Environment and Climate Change Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Pending: House Environment and Climate Change Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to establish a program to make grants to States to assist local educational agencies in voluntary installation and maintenance of filtration stations at schools and child care programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Safe School Drinking Water Act
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3291 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 52.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4805/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4805/BILLS-117hr4805ih.pdf |