US HB4803 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-133. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-133. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes that a foreign-born child of a U.S. citizen member of the Armed Forces or government employee may automatically acquire U.S. citizenship even if the child is not residing in the United States. Currently, a foreign-born child automatically acquires U.S. citizenship if the child (1) has at least one parent who is a citizen, (2) is less than 18 years old, and (3) is residing in the United States in the citizen parent's legal and physical custody pursuant to a lawful admission for permanent residence. Under this bill, the third requirement is fulfilled if a foreign-born child is (1) living in the legal and physical custody of the citizen Armed Services member or government employee who has been stationed abroad (or the accompanying spouse of such a citizen), and (2) lawfully admitted for permanent residence in the United States.
Title
Citizenship for Children of Military Members and Civil Servants Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-133. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-03-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1612) |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9188) |
2019-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4803. |
2019-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9188-9189) |
2019-12-03 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2679 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Citizenship and naturalization
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Family relationships
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Family relationships
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents