US HB4803 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Citizenship for Children of Military Members and Civil Servants Act This bill establishes that a foreign-born child of a U.S. citizen member of the Armed Forces or government employee may automatically acquire U.S. citizenship even if the child is not residing in the United States. Currently, a foreign-born child automatically acquires U.S. citizenship if the child (1) has at least one parent who is a citizen, (2) is less than 18 years old, and (3) is residing in the United States in the citizen parent's legal and physical custody pursuant to a lawful admission for permanent residence. Under this bill, the third requirement is fulfilled if a foreign-born child is (1) living in the legal and physical custody of the citizen Armed Services member or government employee who has been stationed abroad (or the accompanying spouse of such a citizen), and (2) lawfully admitted for permanent residence in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citizenship for Children of Military Members and Civil Servants Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-04SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-12-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-03HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9188)
2019-12-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4803.
2019-12-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9188-9189)
2019-12-03HouseMr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-11-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-10-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-10-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2679 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback