US HB4772 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for clarification under the Medicare program about minimal self-adjustment for off-the-shelf orthotics.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for clarification under the Medicare program about minimal self-adjustment for off-the-shelf orthotics.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2599 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1191 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1191 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4772/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4772/BILLS-115hr4772ih.pdf |