US HB4764 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-12)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and reauthorizes through FY2025 the C.W. Bill Young Cell Transplantation Program, which provides support to patients who need a potentially life-saving bone marrow transplant or umbilical cord blood transplant. It also requires research and other activities related to stem cell therapies. Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services must conduct a periodic review of the science of using adult stem cells and birthing tissues in therapeutic treatments, and the National Institutes of Health must continue efforts to further the field of regenerative medicine using adult stem cells. In addition, the Government Accountability Office must examine various issues related to the regenerative medicine workforce.
Title
TRANSPLANT Act of 2020 Timely ReAuthorization of Necessary Stem-cell Programs Lends Access to Needed Therapies Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 414 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7450-7451) |
2020-12-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.2704 Amendment SA 2704 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.2704 Amendment SA 2704 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S7450-7451; text: CR S7450-7451) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7450-7451) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 211). (text: CR 09/29/2020 H4996) |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5089-5090) |
2020-09-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4764. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4996-4998) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-549. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3520 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4672 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5835)
SB4672 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5835)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Blood and blood diseases
Cell biology and embryology
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Research administration and funding
Blood and blood diseases
Cell biology and embryology
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Research administration and funding