US HB4759 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to pay costs relating to the transportation of certain deceased veterans to veterans' cemeteries owned by a State or tribal organization. This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to pay the burial transportation costs of certain deceased veterans to a state- or tribal-owned veterans' cemetery.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to pay costs relating to the transportation of certain deceased veterans to veterans' cemeteries owned by a State or tribal organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Transportation costs
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Cemeteries and funerals
Transportation costs
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4759/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4759/BILLS-114hr4759ih.pdf |