US HB4737 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to evaluate current federal research and development regarding approaches to mitigate the consequences of climate change on homeland security to identify research and development gaps. DHS must conduct additional research and development to fill those gaps.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Climate Change Research Act
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H991-992) |
2020-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4737. |
2020-02-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H991-993) |
2020-02-10 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-01-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 298. |
2020-01-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-375. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental protection
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Natural disasters
Terrorism
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental protection
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Natural disasters
Terrorism