US HB4723 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses identifying, restoring, and protecting salmon conservation areas in the United States. Specifically, the bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to jointly issue guidance on the process and biological criteria required to identify salmon conservation areas; and directs the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation to provide grants to certain entities to protect or maintain salmon conservation area features and projects that are focused on conservation and restoration within conservation areas, including to restore or maintain ecological functions and processes related to salmon productivity and diversity at watershed or subwatershed scales.
Title
Fish Act of 2019 Salmon Focused Investments in Sustainable Habitats Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Canada
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Federal-Indian relations
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Mining
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Roads and highways
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Canada
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Federal-Indian relations
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Mining
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Roads and highways
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4723/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4723/BILLS-116hr4723ih.pdf |