US HB4717 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Healthy Forests Restoration Act of 2003 with respect to third-party contracts for wildfire hazard fuel removal, to amend the National Forest Management Act with respect to the threshold for advertised timber sales, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Locally Led Restoration Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2023-11-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2023-08-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
2023-07-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-07-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback