US HB4704 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-339.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-339.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to award competitive, merit-reviewed grants to institutions of higher education (or their consortia) to support multidisciplinary, fundamental research with potential relevance to suicide, including potential relevance to prevention and treatment. In awarding such grants, the NSF shall encourage applications submitted by early career researchers, including doctoral students and postdoctoral researchers, to promote the researchers' development.
Title
Advancing Research to Prevent Suicide Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 24 (Y: 385 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-339. |
2021-01-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-01-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-31 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9169-9170) |
2020-12-31 | House | Mrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 4704, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9169-9170) |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7469-7470) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.2706 Amendment SA 2706 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.2706 Amendment SA 2706 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7469-7470; text: CR S7469-7470) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7469-7470) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-01-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 8 (Roll no. 24). (text: CR H549) |
2020-01-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H554-555) |
2020-01-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-01-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H549-550) |
2020-01-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4704. |
2020-01-27 | House | Mr. McAdams moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272. |
2019-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-342. |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-10-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3351 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Medical research
Mental health
Research administration and funding
Education programs funding
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Medical research
Mental health
Research administration and funding