US HB4695 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-40)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PACT Act Protect Against Conflict by Turkey Act This bill addresses Turkey's military invasion of northern Syria. The President shall impose visa- and asset-blocking sanctions on specific Turkish officials connected to the invasion. The Department of State shall report on (1) other Turkish officials involved with the invasion; and (2) foreign persons that knowingly provided defense articles, services, or technology to Turkey that could be used in the invasion. Such foreign persons shall also be subject to visa- and asset-blocking sanctions. The President shall impose financial sanctions on the large Turkish state-owned bank known as Halkbank and on any foreign financial institutions that the State Department determines to have knowingly facilitated significant transactions for the Turkish Armed Forces or Turkey's defense industry related to the invasion. The President shall impose sanctions on Turkey's government pursuant to the Countering America's Adversaries Through Sanctions Act. A U.S. defense article, service, or technology may not be transferred to Turkey's government if it (1) is covered under the Arms Export Control Act, and (2) may be used by Turkey in military operations in northern Syria. The President may not exercise certain emergency waiver authority in relation to this prohibition. Certain Syrians, including Syrian Kurds who have partnered with the U.S. government in Syria, shall be (1) designated as Priority 2 refugees of special humanitarian concern, and (2) exempt from various numerical limitations under immigration law. The bill calls for various reports, including on (1) the national-security impact of the invasion, and (2) the net worth of Turkish President Tayyip Erdogan and his family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PACT Act Protect Against Conflict by Turkey Act

Sponsors

Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]

Roll Calls

2019-10-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 592 (Y: 403 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-30SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-10-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 16 (Roll no. 592). (text: CR H8568-8571)
2019-10-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8584-8585)
2019-10-29HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-10-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4695.
2019-10-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8568-8576)
2019-10-29HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2641 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback