US HB4695 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-41)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses Turkey's military invasion of northern Syria. The President shall impose visa- and asset-blocking sanctions on specific Turkish officials connected to the invasion. The Department of State shall report on (1) other Turkish officials involved with the invasion; and (2) foreign persons that knowingly provided defense articles, services, or technology to Turkey that could be used in the invasion. Such foreign persons shall also be subject to visa- and asset-blocking sanctions. The President shall impose financial sanctions on the large Turkish state-owned bank known as Halkbank and on any foreign financial institutions that the State Department determines to have knowingly facilitated significant transactions for the Turkish Armed Forces or Turkey's defense industry related to the invasion. The President shall impose sanctions on Turkey's government pursuant to the Countering America's Adversaries Through Sanctions Act. A U.S. defense article, service, or technology may not be transferred to Turkey's government if it (1) is covered under the Arms Export Control Act, and (2) may be used by Turkey in military operations in northern Syria. The President may not exercise certain emergency waiver authority in relation to this prohibition. Certain Syrians, including Syrian Kurds who have partnered with the U.S. government in Syria, shall be (1) designated as Priority 2 refugees of special humanitarian concern, and (2) exempt from various numerical limitations under immigration law. The bill calls for various reports, including on (1) the national-security impact of the invasion, and (2) the net worth of Turkish President Tayyip Erdogan and his family.
Title
PACT Act Protect Against Conflict by Turkey Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 592 (Y: 403 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-10-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 16 (Roll no. 592). (text: CR H8568-8571) |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8584-8585) |
2019-10-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4695. |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8568-8576) |
2019-10-29 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2641 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 327.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Family relationships
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Terrorism
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Asia
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Family relationships
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Terrorism
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity