US HB4693 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-37)
Status: Passed on October 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-19 - Became Public Law No: 117-214.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-37)
Status: Passed on October 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-19 - Became Public Law No: 117-214.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To advance targeted and evidence-based interventions for the prevention and treatment of global malnutrition and to improve the coordination of such programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Global Malnutrition Prevention and Treatment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 384 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-19 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-214. |
2022-10-19 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-10-14 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4876; text: 4/27/2022 CR H4547-4548) |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 453. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 44 (Roll no. 137). |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4560) |
2022-04-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4693. |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4547-4550) |
2022-04-27 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2956 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.