US HB4685 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Government Accountability Office to carry out a study on the impact of the gamification, psychological nudges, and other design techniques used by online trading platforms, and for other purposes.
Title
Trading Isn’t a Game Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165. |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-231. |
2021-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |