US HB4673 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the automatic enrollment of eligible veterans in patient enrollment system of Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
EVEST Act Ensuring Veterans’ Smooth Transition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - On passage (Y: 265 N: 163 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 206 N: 221 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - House - On agreeing to the Escobar amendment (A003) H.Amdt.155 (Y: 228 N: 198 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 206 N: 221 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - House - On agreeing to the Escobar amendment (A003) H.Amdt.155 (Y: 228 N: 198 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-01-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-01-20 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 265 - 163 (Roll no. 14). |
2022-01-20 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 221 (Roll no. 13). |
2022-01-20 | House | The previous question on the motion was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-01-20 | House | Mr. Bost moved to recommit to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text: CR H268) |
2022-01-20 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-01-20 | House | H.Amdt.155 On agreeing to the Escobar amendment (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 198 (Roll no. 12). |
2022-01-20 | House | H.Amdt.155 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-01-20 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 860, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Escobar amendment No. 3. |
2022-01-20 | House | H.Amdt.155 Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Escobar. (consideration: CR H266-268; text: CR H266) |
2022-01-20 | House | H.Amdt.154 On agreeing to the Takano amendments (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2022-01-20 | House | H.Amdt.154 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-01-20 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 860, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Mr. Takano amendment en bloc No. 1. |
2022-01-20 | House | H.Amdt.154 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Takano. (consideration: CR H264-266; text: CR H264-265) |
2022-01-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4673. |
2022-01-20 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1836 and H.R. 4673. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-01-20 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 860. (consideration: CR H257-270) |
2022-01-11 | House | Rule H. Res. 860 passed House. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 860 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1836 and H.R. 4673. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-01-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160. |
2022-01-06 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-223. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR860 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.