US HB4660 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jobs for Veterans Act of 2016 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow an increased work opportunity tax credit for employers who hire veterans who have been certified as discharged or released from active duty in the U.S. Armed Forces after September 11, 2001, and who begin work for the employer after December 31, 2015, and before January 1, 2020. This increased credit is in addition to any work opportunity tax credit allowed to a veteran with a service-connected disability.
Title
Jobs for Veterans Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4660/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4660/BILLS-114hr4660ih.pdf |