US HB4659 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 680.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 680.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the appropriate Federal banking agencies to recognize the exposure-reducing nature of client margin for cleared derivatives. This bill amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act, the Bank Holding Company Act of 1956, and the Home Owners' Loan Act to exclude initial client margin funds (i.e., funds lent to a client by a broker to facilitate a derivatives contract) from leverage-exposure calculations for purposes of determining whether an insured depository institution, a bank holding company, or a savings and loan holding company is in compliance with federal leverage-based capital standards.
Title
To require the appropriate Federal banking agencies to recognize the exposure-reducing nature of client margin for cleared derivatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 680. |
2018-08-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-882. |
2018-03-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 16. |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets Prior to Referral. |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3682 (Same As) 2018-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.