US HB4655 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CREEPER Act of 2017 Curbing Realistic Exploitative Electronic Pedophilic Robots Act of 2017
Title
CREEPER Act of 2017 Curbing Realistic Exploitative Electronic Pedophilic Robots Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5119-5120) |
2018-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4655. |
2018-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5119-5121) |
2018-06-13 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |