US HB4647 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand the exclusion for certain conservation subsidies to include subsidies for water conservation or efficiency measures and storm water management measures.
Title
Water Conservation Rebate Tax Parity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB848 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3404 (Related) 2021-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB2430 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5052)
HB5438 (Related) 2021-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HB3404 (Related) 2021-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB2430 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5052)
HB5438 (Related) 2021-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4647/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4647/BILLS-117hr4647ih.pdf |