US HB4644 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for sanctions and assistance related to the conflict in Libya. The President shall impose property- and visa-blocking sanctions on any foreign person providing significant support to a militia or paramilitary group that is (1) knowingly threatening peace or stability in Libya, (2) knowingly engaging in the significant misappropriation or illicit exploitation of Libyan state assets or natural resources, or (3) responsible for or complicit in gross human rights violations in Libya. Such sanctions shall expire on December 31, 2024. The Department of State shall work to strengthen Libya's democratic governance, including by providing assistance to (1) support efforts to resolve the current civil conflict in Libya, (2) unify Libya's financial and governing institutions, and (3) ensure transparent and credible future elections in Libya. The Department of the Treasury shall vote and argue for international financial institutions to support an economic recovery in Libya that supports the establishment of a sovereign state with democratic institutions and rule of law.
Title
Libya Stabilization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5886-5890) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4644. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5886-5892) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 491. |
2020-11-17 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2020-11-17 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-11-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 116-594, Part I. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2934 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Africa
Alliances
Asia
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Egypt
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign property
France
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Human rights
Inflation and prices
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Italy
Libya
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Multilateral development programs
Oil and gas
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Qatar
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
United Arab Emirates
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Water use and supply
Alliances
Asia
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Egypt
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign property
France
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Human rights
Inflation and prices
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Italy
Libya
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Multilateral development programs
Oil and gas
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Qatar
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
United Arab Emirates
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Water use and supply