US HB4641 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8152)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8152)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a reporting requirement for all broadband internet service providers and a capacity requirement for providers that use federal funds to construct new broadband infrastructure. Specifically, the bill requires an internet service provider to report the actual speed of the broadband it provides consumers, and it establishes a fine for any provider that has willfully or knowingly provided false data about the speed it is capable of offering. Additionally, the bill requires any new broadband infrastructure built using federal funds to provide service of at least 100 megabits per second.
Title
Broadband Speed Act
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8152) |
2019-10-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3093 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4641/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4641/BILLS-116hr4641ih.pdf |