US HB463 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to provide a set aside for transportation alternatives.
Title
Transportation Alternatives Enhancements Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/463/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr463/BILLS-117hr463ih.pdf |