US HB4617 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 115-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 1.
Hearing: Oct 22 @ 3:00 pm in H-313 CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SHIELD Act Stopping Harmful Interference in Elections for a Lasting Democracy Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SHIELD Act Stopping Harmful Interference in Elections for a Lasting Democracy Act

Sponsors

Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 1.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-08HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-08HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3873 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4612 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback