US HB4616 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 702.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 702.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employer Relief Act of 2018 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to suspend the employer mandate for health insurance coverage until January 1, 2019. The bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to delay for one year, until after December 31, 2020, the implementation of the excise tax on high cost employer-sponsored health coverage (commonly referred to as the Cadillac tax).
Title
Employer Relief Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 702. |
2018-08-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-906. |
2018-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15. |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-12-12 | House | Introduced in House |