US HB459 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit former Members and elected officers of Congress from lobbying Congress at any time after leaving office, and for other purposes.
Title
HUMBLE Act Halt Unchecked Member Benefits with Lobbying Elimination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Ethics, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Related) 2021-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1412 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB546 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6920 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB7782 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1412 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB546 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6920 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB7782 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr459/BILLS-117hr459ih.pdf |