US HB4578 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counter Terrorist Network Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to expand the duties of the National Targeting Center of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP). Specifically, the center must collaborate with appropriate agencies to enhance border security through such operations as those that seek to disrupt and dismantle networks that pose terrorist or other threats. In addition, the bill authorizes the CBP to assign its personnel to other appropriate agencies. (Sec. 3) The Commissioner of CBP must biannually brief Congress on CBP's activities to disrupt and dismantle such networks.
Title
Counter Terrorist Network Act
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 17 (Y: 410 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-01-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 2 (Roll no. 17). (text: CR 1/9/2018 H40) |
2018-01-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H160) |
2018-01-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4578. |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H40-41) |
2018-01-09 | House | Mr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 366. |
2018-01-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-492. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement officers
Terrorism
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement officers
Terrorism