US HB4577 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic Explosives Detection Canine Capacity Building Act of 2017 This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to establish a working group to determine ways to develop a decentralized domestic canine breeding network to produce high quality explosives detection canines and modernize canine training standards. The working group shall submit to the TSA preliminary behavioral standards, medical standards, and technical standards for such network and training, including recommendations on how the TSA can engage stakeholders to further the development of such network and training. The TSA shall submit a strategy for expanding the network based on such recommendations. The TSA shall issue baseline behavioral standards for explosives detection canines. Such standards, as well as the preliminary medical and technical standards issued pursuant to this bill, shall be incorporated into all statements of work for the TSA explosive detection canine contracts and reflect the detection capabilities required to effectively mitigate terrorist threats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Explosives Detection Canine Capacity Building Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2018-01-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-01-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H32-33)
2018-01-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4577.
2018-01-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H32-34)
2018-01-09HouseMr. Rogers (AL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-01-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362.
2018-01-09HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-488.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback