US HB4569 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counterterrorism Information Sharing Improvement Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the President: (1) acting through the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), to ensure that, for counterterrorism purposes, DHS has access to biographic and biometric data collected by the U.S. government on individuals associated with a terrorist organization; and (2) to direct relevant federal agencies to coordinate with DHS to minimize and overcome any administrative, technical, capacity, or classification challenges to carrying out such requirement. DHS must ensure that all relevant laws, rules, and procedures regarding classification levels and civil rights and civil liberties are followed in carrying out such requirement.
Title
Counterterrorism Information Sharing Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-01-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H48) |
2018-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4569. |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H48-49) |
2018-01-09 | House | Mr. Gallagher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 365. |
2018-01-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-491. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Right of privacy
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Right of privacy
Terrorism