US HB4564 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Post-Caliphate Threat Assessment Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), in coordination with the Department of State and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, to conduct a threat assessment of current foreign terrorist fighter activities. Such assessment shall include: (1) a detailed summary of current foreign terrorist fighter travel and trends, (2) an analysis of any country or region with a significant increase in foreign terrorist fighter activity, and (3) an analysis of foreign terrorist fighter travel trends in and out of Iraq and Syria. DHS shall submit a report of such assessment to Congress within 180 days after enactment of this bill.
Title
Post-Caliphate Threat Assessment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 3 (Y: 413 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-01-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 3). (text: CR H47) |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H62-63) |
2018-01-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4564. |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H47) |
2018-01-09 | House | Mr. Higgins (LA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 363. |
2018-01-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-489. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Syria
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Syria
Terrorism
Travel and tourism