US HB4559 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 572.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 572.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Global Aviation System Security Reform Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to conduct a global aviation security review to address improving aviation security standards, including standards intended to mitigate cybersecurity threats, across the global aviation system. The security review shall establish best practices regarding: collaborating with foreign partners to improve global aviation security capabilities and standards; identifying foreign partners that have not successfully implemented security protocols from the International Civil Aviation Organization or the Department of Homeland Security and have not taken steps to implement such protocols; improving the development, outreach, and implementation process for security directives or emergency amendments issued to domestic and foreign air carriers; and assessing the cybersecurity and cyber espionage risk of security screening equipment. (Sec. 4) The TSA shall report to Congress: (1) within 90 days after enactment of this bill, on the organization, development, and progress of the security review; and (2) within 240 days after enactment, on best practices identified by the review and TSA actions to implement such practices.
Title
Global Aviation System Security Reform Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 572. |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-01-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H41-42) |
2018-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4559. |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H41-43) |
2018-01-09 | House | Mr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 370. |
2018-01-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-497. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
International organizations and cooperation
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
International organizations and cooperation
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security